SANMIT SINGH AHUJA
-
About SANMIT SINGH AHUJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40106DL2015PTC276748 EOS ENERCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2015 - U40106DL2015PTC277341 V. R. POWER DYNAMICS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/02/2015 - U40300DL2010PTC209626 ZEUS ENVIRONERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 25/03/2011 - U74140DL2013PTC249634 RADOX CONSULTANTS SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/04/2013 - U74140DL2013PTC251954 ETI DYNAMICS PRIVATE LIMITED 1975740.0 Active 13/05/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
SIDHARTH DIXIT Director HARVINDER SINGH LAHRI Director SANJEEV DEO Director