SRINIVAS ALURI
-
About SRINIVAS ALURI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25209TG1997PTC027845 HARA CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 10/05/2017 - U25209TG2016PTC109728 MODULUS COMPOSITES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/05/2016 - U25209TG2016PTC109980 MODULUS COMPOSITES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Not available for efiling 30/05/2016 - U67200TG1999PTC031959 HARA INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 7000000.0 Active 27/05/2011 -