SANDIP AGARWAL
-
About SANDIP AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40101TG2017FTC120000 MAHARASHTRA RESCO ROOFTOP SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/11/2017 - U40106TG2017FTC119999 MADHYA PRADESH ROOFTOP SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/11/2017 - U40106TG2017FTC120023 GUJARAT RESCO ROOFTOP SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/11/2017 - U40106TG2017PTC114310 TEP ROOFTOP SOLAR INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 10266720.0 Active 04/04/2017 - U40106TG2018PTC122554 KADUR SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/02/2018 - U40106TG2018PTC122572 RANIBENUR SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/02/2018 - U40107TG2017FTC120006 KARNATAKA RESCO ROOFTOP SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/11/2017 - U40300TG2017FTC120011 ANDHRA PRADESH RESCO ROOFTOP SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/11/2017 - U40300TG2018PTC122598 ARSIKERE SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/02/2018 - U74120TG2013PTC086548 TEP SOLAR INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 87716860.0 Active 13/06/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
RADHE SHAYAM GOYAL Director RAVISHANKAR TUMULURI Director