SHYAM SUNDAR SHARMA
-
About SHYAM SUNDAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27104WB1996PTC080373 RADHIKA ELECTRO-CAST PRIVATE LIMITED 8693000.0 Active 26/07/2011 - U27109WB1996PTC080292 ALOGOMA MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 24734000.0 Active 01/07/2015 - U28113WB2000PLC092086 SKYSCRAPERS STEELS LIMITED 139103000.0 Active 04/11/2011 - U51101WB2010PTC146859 EASTERN TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 1573000.0 Active 14/07/2012 - U51109WB2005PTC101653 SUNBRIGHT VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 07/10/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
SUBHENDU BHATTACHERJEE Director GOPAL CHAND MORE Director