SACHIN KUMAR GARG
-
About SACHIN KUMAR GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25112HR1974PTC007207 HISSAR TUBES PVT LTD 28500000.0 Active 01/02/2016 - U27100DL1991PLC043602 PRAKASH ISPAT LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 10/01/2011 - U74899DL1970PTC005221 GOEL PLASTICO PVT LTD 1972000.0 Active 10/01/2011 - U74899DL1986PTC023077 SHIKHA MERCANTILE PVT LTD 9000000.0 Active 06/02/2016 - U74899DL1991PTC046781 SUNVIN TRADING AND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 25000000.0 Active 03/02/2016 - U74899DL1992PTC047255 NEW ERA COMMERCE AND SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 23000000.0 Active 02/02/2016 - U74899DL1994PTC057517 CHAIBASA STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 17500000.0 Active 10/01/2011 - U74899DL1994PTC058645 SHREE LABH LAKSHMI CAPITAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 46301500.0 Active 03/02/2016 - U74899HR1987PTC041353 VANSHI FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 35000000.0 Active 03/02/2016 - U74899HR1989PTC041279 GMK BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 167500000.0 Active 01/02/2016 -