SUDHIR ARYA
-
About SUDHIR ARYA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U31102KL1963SGC002043 TRANSFORMERS AND ELECTRICALS KERALA LTD 429696000.0 Active 31/10/2011 - U40104DL2008PTC183024 NABINAGAR POWER GENERATING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 33198710000.0 Active 21/05/2015 - U40105DL2005PTC138458 RATNAGIRI GAS AND POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 38202724150.0 Active 21/09/2017 - U40105DL2006PTC156884 ARAVALI POWER COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 27970164000.0 Active 05/05/2015 - U40108DL2002GOI116635 NTPC ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY LIMITED 809100.0 Active 07/11/2017 - U65991DL2012GOI233601 IIFCL ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED 125000000.0 Active 30/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors