SUNIL KUMAR SINGH
-
About SUNIL KUMAR SINGH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27104TN1996PLC036793 OPG INDUSTRIES LIMITED 37644470.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U40106TN2016PTC111070 SAMRIDDHI SURYA VIDYUT PRIVATE LIMITED 122500000.0 Active 23/06/2016 - U40300TN2016PTC111045 OPG SURYA VIDYUT PRIVATE LIMITED 62500000.0 Active 22/06/2016 - U40300TN2016PTC111242 SAMRIDDHI SOLAR POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 125000000.0 Active 01/07/2016 - U61100TN2008PTC068561 GITA ENERGY GENERATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/08/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
SUDHIR SINGHI Director RAJENDRAN SATISH Director VISHAL KEYAL Director