SUBBA KALLEPALLI RAJU
-
About SUBBA KALLEPALLI RAJU,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U33112TG2014PTC092724 MY HEALTH WELLNESS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/04/2016 - U40106TG2017PTC116429 AXIS WIND FARMS (RAKETLA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/04/2017 - U40108TG2010PTC071199 AXIS ENERGY VENTURES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 17200000.0 Active 21/12/2016 - U40108TG2011PTC076053 AXIS WIND FARMS (RAYALASEEMA) PRIVATE LIMITED 420300000.0 Active 13/01/2017 - U40108TG2011PTC076055 AXIS WIND FARMS (NALLAKONDA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/04/2016 - U40108TG2013PTC085400 RAYALASEEMA WIND FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2016 - U40108TG2013PTC085540 REPOWER PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/10/2016 - U40300TG2016PTC103597 RE POWER SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/02/2016 - U40300TG2016PTC103806 AXIS WIND FARMS (KURNOOL) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/03/2016 - U40300TG2017PTC116431 AXIS WIND FARMS (AMIDYALA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/04/2017 - -
Associated with Directors