SANJEET SINGH TALWAR
-
About SANJEET SINGH TALWAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U34105UP1994PTC016649 A AUTO MOVERS PRIVATE LIMITED 15652000.0 Active 06/02/2013 - U45400UP2013PTC054970 S.G. INFRACARE PRIVATE LIMITED 3100000.0 Active 12/02/2013 - U45400UP2013PTC055477 S.G. PALACE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/03/2013 - U70102UP2010PTC040734 MANGO URBAN PLANNERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/12/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
BHUPENDER SINGH TALWAR Director HARVINDER KAUR Director ASHISH TALWAR Director NIKHIL KUMAR TOLANI Director