SANDEEP AGARWAL
-
About SANDEEP AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2008PTC129567 PADMAWATI INFRAREALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2016 - U51101WB2010PTC151375 KAPINDRA DEALER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/05/2017 - U51909WB2010PTC151368 CHANDARMOULI MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/05/2017 - U51909WB2010PTC151373 CHAKDHAR VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/05/2017 - U74900WB2010PTC151416 ALLWORTH COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/05/2017 - U74900WB2010PTC151512 FIRST POINT TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/05/2017 - U74900WB2010PTC151624 FIRST POINT TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/05/2017 - U74900WB2012PTC189090 NEWEVER MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 21/02/2013 - U74900WB2012PTC189091 NIGHTBIRD MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 15/02/2013 - U74900WB2012PTC189092 SAFALTA AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 15/02/2013 - U74999WB2011PTC158370 SINGLE POINT SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 30/12/2015 - U74999WB2012PTC179967 KALASHDHAN VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 16/01/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
SIDDHESWAR HALDER Director KANHAIYALAL DIDWANIA Director RAKESH KUMAR KHEMANI Director