SANCHIT GARG
-
About SANCHIT GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403DL2012PTC242536 SOURCEWELL AGRO FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 08/03/2014 - U15313DL1997PTC089546 VISHWAS FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 08/03/2014 - U28910DL2004PLC129444 SUNSTAR PRECISION FORGE LIMITED 437000000.0 Active 01/07/2013 - U67190DL2008PTC186084 PROJECT PORTFOLIO MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 13496250.0 Converted to LLP 01/12/2013 - U74899DL1993PTC055403 FATEH OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 300700.0 Active 10/06/2015 - -
Associated with Directors