SHRIRAJ SADASHIV SHETTY
-
About SHRIRAJ SADASHIV SHETTY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51101MH2012PTC234846 NIRMIT MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 17/06/2013 - U51909MH2014PTC252433 SKYWOOD TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/05/2014 - U52100MH2013PTC239707 ALDEN EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 10/06/2014 - U52100MH2014PTC251674 SUBHANG TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/04/2014 - U52300MH2014PTC252270 SANURAG TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 10/04/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
YOGESH CHANDRASHEKAR KHEDEKAR Director SADASHIV KANYANA SHETTY Director