SOURENDRA KARMAKAR
-
About SOURENDRA KARMAKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2008PTC124598 SIDDHANT COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 07/02/2014 - U70102WB2013PTC189733 ACCUPHASE PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 25/03/2014 - U70102WB2013PTC198661 DUNES REALCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/08/2017 - U70102WB2014PTC203154 AMITRAJ REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2014 - U70102WB2015PTC204904 MAGNEPAN REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 06/12/2016 - U70200WB1988PTC044904 AMITRAJ INVESTMENT PVT LTD 1861700.0 Active 03/10/2013 - U74900WB2013PTC197293 AMTEK MERCHANDISE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/08/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
NIKITA KEJRIWAL Director AMITABH KEJRIWAL Director RAJKUMARI KEJRIWAL Director