SARVESH ELESH KHARA
-
About SARVESH ELESH KHARA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U11100MH2016PTC273500 UNITY CYLINDERS & EQUIPMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/02/2016 - U11100RJ2014PTC046258 JAYPORE BLUEFLAMES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/09/2014 - U23200MH1999PLC118096 GASPOINT PETROLEUM (INDIA) LIMITED 49990000.0 Active 01/04/2015 - U23203MH2003PTC141031 CONFIDENCE LPG BOTTLING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U23203MH2006PTC161155 CONFIDENCE TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U23203MH2006PTC161197 ZHEJIANG LANFENG MACHINE CO PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U24111CT1994PTC008870 PAPUSHA GASES PVT LTD 2208000.0 Active in Progress 30/03/2016 - U27109TG1981PTC003187 AGRASEN STEEL TUBES PVT LTD 1000000.0 Active 26/09/2015 - U40200MH2008PLC182126 CONFIDENCE GO GAS ENERGY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U74900KA2014PTC076479 ARIHANTH BLUE FLAME PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/09/2014 - U74900TG2016PTC103719 S. V. ENGINEERING & EQUIPMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/02/2017 - U74999MH2016PTC280422 UNITY INFRABUS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/04/2016 - U74999MH2017PTC300803 SURAJ CYLINDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/10/2017 - -
Associated with Directors