SRINIVASA KUMAR MANTHENA
-
About SRINIVASA KUMAR MANTHENA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100TG2005PTC045512 ARUNADRI AGRO-FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2015 - U01100TG2005PTC045513 ARUNACHALA BIO-TECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2015 - U01100TG2005PTC045514 NEELAGIRI GREENLANDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2015 - U13209TG2009PTC062922 DIVI MINES & MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/05/2016 - U14290TG2009PTC063116 SARVOCH MINES & INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/05/2016 - U40105TG2008PTC057856 BHAKRA POWER GENERATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U40105TG2008PTC057857 ABHAYA ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45209TG2011PTC075401 NEW KAKINADA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2015 - U52100TG2015PTC097281 SUNRITA ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 20100000.0 Active 19/01/2015 - U65990TG1995PTC020511 SNR INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 999900.0 Active 16/03/2015 - U70102TG2004PTC042920 R.R.J.R. ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2015 - U74930TG2015PTC097286 AZIMECH ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors