SANDEEP JAIN
-
About SANDEEP JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14435HR2001PTC034720 SILVERLINE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 15437500.0 Active 25/07/2017 - U51311DL1998PTC096121 TALWAR IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 7500000.0 Active 19/03/2015 - U51909DL2011PLC228261 ALLIED NIPPON COMPONENTS LIMITED 24000000.0 Active 23/05/2017 - U74899DL1989PLC036238 ALLIED INTERTRADE COMPANY LIMITED 13903800.0 Active 30/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
HARI SINGH BORA Director ROHAN TALWAR Director VIKAS UPPAL Director SANJEEV KUMAR ARORA Director