SANDEEP AGARWAL
-
About SANDEEP AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122WB2014PTC204249 FLAVORY FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/03/2017 - U17200WB2004PTC100552 SATVICHAR CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 4533000.0 Converted to LLP 13/04/2015 - U65923WB2004PTC100553 SUVICHAR ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 4553000.0 Converted to LLP 13/04/2015 - U74120WB2007PTC115060 GAURI ADVISORY PRIVATE LIMITED 3570000.0 Active 05/04/2015 - U74999WB2012PTC184662 CLEARPRO CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/09/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
NARSINGH MITTAL Director