SANJAY RAMUGADE DINKAR
-
About SANJAY RAMUGADE DINKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1981PTC025008 KAVERI ESTATES PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 12/12/2017 - U45200MH2004PTC147521 HAMPSHIRE DEVELOPERS AND TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/12/2017 - U45201MH1981PTC025133 QUEENS CONSTRUCTION PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 13/12/2017 - U45202MH1982PTC027414 VBR BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 12/12/2017 - U45202MH2011PTC212247 NEELYAMUNA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/12/2017 - U45400MH2011PTC212099 CASABIANCA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 14/08/2017 - U51909MH2004PTC146301 BEAU YAMUNA TRADERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/12/2017 - U51909MH2004PTC146319 V RAHEJA DEVELOPERS AND BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/12/2017 - U51909MH2004PTC147440 CHARKOP DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2017 - U55100MH2003PTC141954 LEMAN HOTELS AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2015 - U67120MH1987PTC042592 NEEL SARITA INVESTMENT AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2015 - U70100MH1973PTC016772 VIJAY RAHEJA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 15/05/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
VIJAY BHAGWANDAS RAHEJA Director SUNIL ATMARAM VALANI Director ADITYA DEEPAK RAHEJA Director