SANJAY TIWARI
-
About SANJAY TIWARI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U33111WB2016PTC209503 MAMTORA LENS TECHNOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 23/12/2016 - U33120GJ2006PTC047676 ESSILOR DELTA CNC LENS PRIVATE LIMITED 15000000.0 Active 22/11/2016 - U33201GJ2013PTC074444 DEEPAK LENS PRIVATE LIMITED 23000000.0 Active 17/03/2016 - U33202GJ2009PTC058889 ESSILOR LENS & SPECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 35000000.0 Active 12/12/2016 - -
Associated with Directors