SANJYOT NILESH RANGNEKAR
-
About SANJYOT NILESH RANGNEKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1988PTC048628 ARIHANT PREMISES PVT LTD 70500000.0 Active 30/01/2017 - U45200MH1995PTC093041 LODHA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1131080000.0 Active 21/06/2016 - U45200MH2012PTC235599 BELLISSIMO DEVELOPERS THANE PRIVATE LIMITED 7100000.0 Active 13/07/2017 - U45400MH2007PTC173512 ANANTNATH CONSTRUCTIONS AND FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 364440000.0 Active 13/01/2017 - U62200MH2013PTC247297 LODHA AVIATION PRIVATE LIMITED 96000000.0 Amalgamated 12/01/2017 - U70104MH1935PLC002249 SHREENIWAS COTTON MILLS LIMITED 1986166600.0 Active 21/11/2016 - U70109MH2007PTC166867 SIDDHNATH RESIDENTIAL PARADISE PRIVATE LIMITED 60000000.0 Active 16/01/2017 - -
Associated with Directors