TEYJAS SCHAE
-
About TEYJAS SCHAE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27104MH1960PLC011834 GRAHAM FIRTH STEEL PRODUCTS (INDIA) LIMITED 10673850.0 Active 30/04/2007 - U01421KA1965PTC001588 NAGRI MINING PRIVATE LIMITED 2230000.0 Active 14/11/1988 - U13100KA1973PTC002287 ROYAL INSWOOL PRIVATE LIMITED 291100.0 Active 14/11/1988 - U15430KA2011PTC057195 JUS' TRUFS CHOCOLATIERS COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/02/2011 - U24119KA1955PTC036520 IVY TRADERS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 120500.0 Active 24/01/2008 - U27101KA1973PTC002322 DANDDELI FERRO PRIVATE LIMITED 9900000.0 Active 19/11/2007 - U45201KA2007PTC043884 ALTEX LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/09/2007 - U45201KA2007PTC043936 EXALT PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 24/09/2007 - U67120MH1983PTC031296 EKA INVESTMENT ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 18/02/2011 - U70100KA2011PTC059339 ELCAN LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/06/2011 - U74900KA2011PTC060251 TEXLA B-TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/09/2011 - U90001KA2011PTC060129 EXALT ENVIROKLEN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/08/2011 - -
Associated with Directors