TARAK ASHOK PATEL
-
About TARAK ASHOK PATEL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L29199GJ1962PLC001171 GMM PFAUDLER LIMITED 29235000.0 Active 30/01/2007 - L63020MH1919PLC000640 SKYLINE MILLARS LIMITED 40224250.0 Active 29/12/2003 - U26956MH1996PLC098884 READY MIX CONCRETE LIMITED 475000.0 Active 24/08/2002 - U28910MH2004PTC149955 DIETRICH ENGINEERING CONSULTANTS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 10/12/2004 - U29240MH1971PTC015240 MILLARS MACHINERY CO PVT LIMITED 1250000.0 Active 28/03/2001 - U29299MH1999PTC120374 MILLARS CONCRETE TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 23/02/2010 - U45200MH1946PTC005238 CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION& ENGINEERING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 480000.0 Active 26/03/2002 - U65990MH1981PTC025866 UTTARAK ENTERPRISES PVT LTD 45000.0 Active 28/03/2001 - -
Associated with Directors