TRILOKCHAND GOVINDRAM AGARWAL
-
About TRILOKCHAND GOVINDRAM AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01110GJ1982PTC005293 AMALTASH (PLANTATIONS) PVT LTD 3071500.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 04/07/1996 - U45201GJ1988PTC010799 GOYAL AND CO (CONSTRUCTIONS)PVT LTD 31380000.0 Active 05/04/1995 - U45201GJ2006PTC047742 ORCHID PLAZA DESIGN AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 28913150.0 Active 01/10/2011 - U45201GJ2007PTC051639 S.G.V. INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 15360000.0 Active 01/01/2009 - U52190GJ1998PTC033776 ASIA-PERFECT MULTILINK PRIVATE LIMITED. 400000.0 Active 05/04/2002 - U70100GJ1994PTC023863 GALAXY REAL ESTATE DEVELOPERS (GUJ) PRIVATE LIMITED 20660000.0 Active 01/06/2013 -