TARUN MENGI
-
About TARUN MENGI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27310DL2006PTC150863 NAVIS ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2006 - U55204DL2008PTC173680 SUPAN HERITAGE RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 20/08/2015 - U70102DL2010PTC199562 PILERNE ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/05/2014 - U74899DL1976PTC008247 SUPAN INTERNATIONAL PVT LTD 502000.0 Active 10/12/1998 - U74899DL1991PTC042687 BAWA PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 16/12/2013 -