TARUN BANSAL
-
About TARUN BANSAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U00500DL2005PTC140238 ISHWAR SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 519000.0 Active 31/08/2005 - U01111DL2005PTC135129 A T AGRO FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 115000.0 Active 13/11/2006 - U45102DL1996PTC080845 JANAM BHUMI DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3082000.0 Active 03/08/1996 - U45200DL2011PTC217962 LUCERNE CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 07/03/2012 - U45201DL2005PTC140237 RAMA SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 417000.0 Active 31/08/2005 - U45400UP2014PTC065138 NAMODEVAY INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/04/2016 - U50300UP1992PTC014109 SETH RATAN LAL ENTERTAINMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 3778500.0 Active 01/10/2013 - U55101DL2009PTC193281 PREM HOLIDAYS PRIVATE LIMITED 2402000.0 Active 18/08/2009 - U70109UP1989PTC010646 ANKUR HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 1439500.0 Active 07/04/1989 - U70109UP1998PTC023526 VIMAL HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 1487000.0 Active 02/06/1998 - U74899DL2005PTC138646 NAT AGROTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 13/07/2005 - U80302DL2011PTC212175 VIMAL EDUCATIONAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 04/01/2011 - -
Associated with Directors