TAIZOON FAKHRUDDIN KHORAKIWALA
-
About TAIZOON FAKHRUDDIN KHORAKIWALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15209MH2006PTC165510 FTK FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2010 - U15400MH2004PTC145147 SWITZ BAKERIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/03/2004 - U31908KL1995PLC009071 INDO GERMAN CARBONS LIMITED 61300070.0 Active 09/12/1996 - U51494GJ1999PTC035900 MUKHI APPARELS PRIVATE LIMITED 6425000.0 Active 01/04/2016 - U52110WB1991PTC051626 SWITZ FOODS PVT LTD 13087800.0 Active 12/09/1998 - U55101MH2005PTC156209 MOHILI MEADOWS RESORT PRIVATE LIMITED 32500000.0 Active 15/06/2007 - U70200MH2008PTC179206 SENTOSA ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/03/2008 - -
Associated with Directors