TARUN RAGHAV
-
About TARUN RAGHAV,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45203DL2012PTC237994 SAI ADHIRAAJ LAND & PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 14000000.0 Active 25/06/2012 - U51101WB2010PTC147559 SHEETLA VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 103000.0 Active 01/03/2011 - U51109WB2008PTC125668 VENUS VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 2230000.0 Active 01/12/2011 - U51909WB2010PTC146235 SHIVDHAN COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/05/2012 - U51909WB2010PTC146237 SURABHI VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/05/2012 - U70109DL2008PTC178745 MALIHA REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 3826000.0 Active 14/03/2011 - U74900DL2009PTC192026 HANS RICE & SOLVENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/04/2013 - -
Associated with Directors