TARANG GUPTA
-
About TARANG GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45202UP2013PTC060153 KANHA INFRAVISION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/10/2013 - U45400DL2007PTC162152 KHATUSHYAM INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 1300000.0 Active 31/05/2013 - U45400DL2007PTC163771 VERVE BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/05/2013 - U45400DL2007PTC165106 KANHA INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED. 1240000.0 Active 02/01/2015 - U45400DL2008PTC182985 KESHAV INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 05/01/2015 - U70109DL2006PTC149767 RKS INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 4155000.0 Active 01/01/2015 - U70109DL2006PTC152109 AKS INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 1955000.0 Active 31/05/2013 - U70109DL2006PTC152194 KANAV INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 1725000.0 Active 01/12/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
ANITA GUPTA Director