TARUN BANERJEE
-
About TARUN BANERJEE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2011PTC156888 AKUL TRADE-LINK PRIVATE LIMITED 170400.0 Active 21/08/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC157009 MANSI VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 21/08/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC157010 MUDRA DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 140400.0 Active 18/03/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC157238 RUDRA COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 130000.0 Active 18/03/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC157239 TARU DEALCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 130400.0 Active 21/08/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC157240 TULSI DEALMARK PRIVATE LIMITED 130400.0 Active 18/03/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC157694 SHUK VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 18/03/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC158788 UMANG TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 25/08/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC158956 TULA COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 21/08/2014 - U51909WB2012PTC174014 GAJGAMINI VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 157500.0 Active 27/08/2014 - U51909WB2012PTC174077 JATASHIV DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 157500.0 Active 25/08/2014 - U51909WB2012PTC174078 HARDSOFT DEALCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 157500.0 Active 26/08/2014 - U51909WB2012PTC174082 PACIFY MARCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 157500.0 Active 26/08/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
NIMAI KUMAR PAKRAY Director GOUTAM DALAL Director DAMODAR DAS Director MANGAT MAL SETHIA Director