UDAY HASMUKHLAL VORA
-
About UDAY HASMUKHLAL VORA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22122GJ1981PTC004619 VIPUL FORMS AND GRAPHICS PVT LTD 91417210.0 Active 01/07/2011 - U29199GJ1956PTC000592 MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURERS PRIVATE LIMITED 990000.0 Under Liquidation 17/05/2014 - U45200GJ2006PTC047680 H.NYALCHAND HOLDING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 30385000.0 Amalgamated 07/02/2006 - U45201GJ2007PTC050605 SAFAL BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 37875000.0 Active 01/04/2008 - U45201GJ2007PTC051639 S.G.V. INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 15360000.0 Active 01/09/2007 - U45202GJ2006PTC049459 SAFAL ORGANISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 27/11/2006 - U45209GJ2006PTC048102 SAFAL REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 129023450.0 Active 15/04/2006 - U45400GJ2011PTC067693 TERACON BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 12/07/2012 - U51909GJ1942PLC000168 BHARAT BOBBINS LIMITED 1000000.0 Under Liquidation 17/05/2014 - -
Associated with Directors