UPENDRA ANANT KULKARNI
-
About UPENDRA ANANT KULKARNI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100MH2003PTC142688 DAHIGAON FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/10/2003 - U45201MH2006PTC165439 SHRISTI INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2010 - U45203MH2007PTC177023 FORTRESS INFRA SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/12/2007 - U65900MH1995PLC090120 FORTRESS FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 50000000.0 Active 30/06/1995 - U65910MH1996PTC101858 FORTRESS CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/01/2000 - U65990MH1996PTC096020 RELAX FINLEASE PRIVATE LIMITED 824600.0 Active 15/10/2003 - U67120MH1995PTC086536 CENTURION PRIMA ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 15306400.0 Active 09/04/1995 - U67120MH1995PTC088475 UNNATI ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 15150150.0 Active 15/06/1995 - U67120MH2004PTC145815 FORTRESS CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 11250000.0 Active 21/04/2004 - U70102MH2007PTC174298 INTEGRITY ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 13337500.0 Active 19/09/2007 - U70102MH2007PTC174592 AAVISHKAR REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 18685000.0 Active 28/09/2007 - U72200MH2000PTC126819 BLESS NET INDIA ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 14987090.0 Active 29/05/2000 -