UTTAM KUMAR SAHA
-
About UTTAM KUMAR SAHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200DL2011PTC229450 LOTUS PROPCON PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 11/04/2017 - U45203DL2012PTC237041 APTARA CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 235200000.0 Active 03/06/2014 - U45400DL2011PTC215175 LOTUS INFRAMART PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 10/04/2017 - U51109WB2007PTC120437 ANGELICA DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 19/11/2007 - U51901WB2003PTC096997 WEST BENGAL LOTTERY STOCKISTS SYNDICATE PRIVATE LIMITED 9105000.0 Active 19/09/2003 01/10/2014 U51909WB2008PTC124229 FASTNER COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 16/06/2008 - U51909WB2008PTC129546 BINDAAS TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/09/2008 - U51909WB2011PTC160971 DIVYAJYOTI DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 21/03/2011 - U70101DL2013PTC247639 BROOMFIELD CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 206000000.0 Active 03/06/2014 - U70109DL2013PTC250124 PARAZONE INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 191000000.0 Active 03/06/2014 - U70109DL2013PTC250890 GREENFEST TECHBUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 125600000.0 Active 03/06/2014 - U70200DL2013PTC251090 PRIMEZONE CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 125000000.0 Active 03/06/2014 - U74140DL2012PTC236353 RUDRAA HOMEBUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 318600000.0 Active 16/01/2015 - U74999WB2008PTC127051 JAIBAM JAITARA DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2008 - -
Associated with Directors