UTKARSH AGARWAL
-
About UTKARSH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400UP2009PTC036849 V A INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/02/2009 - U51109WB2007PTC115544 BAKLIWAL VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 4112500.0 Active 11/06/2010 - U51109WB2008PTC121339 JASMINE COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2155000.0 Active 24/05/2010 - U70102UP2011PTC045008 VAIBHAV INFRAPLANNER PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 27/05/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
AKANSHA AGARWAL Director MAHESH KUMAR GUPTA Director BABITA AGRAWAL Director NAWANSHU GOYAL Director