UTKARSH SANTOSH SARDA
-
About UTKARSH SANTOSH SARDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403MH2014PTC255195 DESERVE GREEN REVOLUTION PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 01/04/2014 - U45202MH2014PTC254915 DESERVE HOUSCORP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2014 - U45309MH2014PTC254976 DESERVE CITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/03/2014 - U45400MH2014PTC254836 DESERVE ARCADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/03/2014 - U45400MH2014PTC254911 DESERVE SPACES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2014 - U51909MH2006PTC166051 DESERVE EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 140772500.0 Active 29/05/2013 - U55101MH2014PTC255053 DESERVE AASHIYANA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/03/2014 - U70102MH2010PLC201082 DESERVE BUILDERS & DEVELOPER LIMITED 130000000.0 Active 20/05/2014 - U70102MH2010PTC210155 DESERVE CREATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2014 - U70102MH2010PTC210824 DESERVE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/06/2015 - U70109MH2009PTC196359 DESERVE BUILDERS & DEVELOPER (KURAR) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2014 - U70109MH2010PTC211062 DESERVE STAR DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2014 - U70200MH2010PTC211019 DESERVE CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2014 - U72300MH2008PTC183609 DESERVE TECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
SANTOSH KUMAR SARDA Director MANISH LAXMAN SARDA Director DEEPAK LAXMAN SARDA Director