UTTAM KUMAR SHARMA
-
About UTTAM KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201WB1988PTC044159 AB CONSTRUCTIONS PVT LTD 25750000.0 Active 18/03/2016 - U45400MH2012PLC231497 LEONE INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 128900000.0 Active 01/02/2014 - U67190MH2012PTC235380 MASSIVE COMMODITIES AND TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/11/2014 - U70200RJ2017PTC057959 DMU INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/05/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
PRAVEEN PALIWAL Director PRAVEEN JANGID Director SURESH SAINI Director ANKIT KUMAR SHARMA Director