VIDYA MADHUSUDAN MURKUMBI
-
About VIDYA MADHUSUDAN MURKUMBI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L01542KA1995PLC019046 SHREE RENUKA SUGARS LIMITED 945246580.0 Active 01/04/2009 - L40104KA1980PLC075720 RAVINDRA ENERGY LIMITED 1179226500.0 Active 14/08/2014 - U15330KA2008PLC047205 SHREE RENUKA AGRI VENTURES LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U15420MH2002PLC135111 RATNAPRABHA SUGARS LIMITED 1500000.0 Amalgamated 23/07/2008 - U15429KA2000PLC026433 GOKAK SUGARS LIMITED 351750000.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U23201MH2003PTC140551 GODAVARI BIOFUEL PRIVATE LIMITED 460000.0 Amalgamated 23/07/2008 - U40102KA2008PLC045442 SHREE RENUKA ENERGY LIMITED 1128990000.0 Amalgamated 28/02/2008 - U65910KA1997PTC022644 KHANDEPAR INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 13/08/1997 - -
Associated with Directors