VIJAY LAXMAN KELKAR
-
About VIJAY LAXMAN KELKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24100MH1983PLC029442 LUPIN LIMITED 904055084.0 Active 29/01/2010 - L27102MH1994PLC152925 JSW STEEL LIMITED 10061715550.0 Active 20/01/2010 - L67120MH1986PLC038784 JM FINANCIAL LIMITED 797587750.0 Active 19/03/2010 - U63013DL2004PLC217305 GO AIRLINES (INDIA) LIMITED 1500000000.0 Active 21/06/2011 - U63030MH2005PTC152747 NATIONAL BULK HANDLING CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 1193825000.0 Active 05/08/2014 - U65929MH2016PTC284282 AVANTI FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 70000000.0 Active 01/08/2016 - U65929MH2016PTC286640 AVANTI MICROFINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 70000000.0 Active 18/10/2016 - U74990KA2008NPL078948 INDIAN INSTITUTE FOR HUMAN SETTLEMENTS 13950000.0 Active 28/04/2010 - -
Associated with Directors