VISHWAS JAYWANT VARDE
-
About VISHWAS JAYWANT VARDE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24100MH1975PTC018068 LIBERTY CHEMICALS PRIVATE LIMITED 18600000.0 Active 11/04/2011 - U25202MH1987PTC044958 TRIMPACKS SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 17/06/1999 - U32106MH1982PTC027777 EXCALIBUR MANAGEMENT CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 100500.0 Active 20/11/2017 - U32108MH1972PTC016080 IEEC POWER ELECTRONICS PRIVATE LIMITED 1386000.0 Active 29/12/2001 - U51909MH2008PTC182118 LORA TRADEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/05/2008 - U72200KA2001PTC029525 XALTED INFORMATION SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 23255550.0 Active 27/01/2014 - U74900MH2015PTC260629 IACUITY SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/02/2017 - U74999MH2017PTC301968 GLOBAS CITIZENSHIP PROFESSIONALS PRIVATELIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/11/2017 - -
Associated with Directors