VINEET AGARWAL
-
About VINEET AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U19131UP1977PLC004436 TRIVENI HANDLOOMS LIMITED 2400070.0 Active 14/07/2001 - U45300DL2008PTC183677 SHRI BALAJI INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3450000.0 Active 17/02/2012 - U45400DL2012PLC241204 SBIPL PROJECTS LIMITED 49879000.0 Active 28/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172559 ALLMOST VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 1412000.0 Active 25/08/2014 - U70102UP2010PTC042935 DELTA INFRAVENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/12/2010 - U74999UP2017PTC096651 SMA MINERAL TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 04/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors