VINAY KAILASHCHANDRA SEKSARIA
-
About VINAY KAILASHCHANDRA SEKSARIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51100MH1983PLC030782 ISHWARSHAKTI HOLDING & TRADERS LIMITED 14400000.0 Active 28/03/2007 - U15100MH1984PTC032478 SEKSARIA CONFECTIONARIES PRIVATE LIMITED 4150000.0 Active 24/03/1984 - U15142GJ1948PTC000608 BHAVNAGAR OIL MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 02/04/2007 - U17100MH1987PTC044996 ANUSHREE FABRICS PRIVATE LIMITED 1292000.0 Active 26/07/1988 - U17120MH1948PTC006225 SEKSARIA INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 9800000.0 Active 02/03/1983 - U40102MH1939PLC002892 THE SEKSARIA BISWAN SUGAR FACTORY LIMIITED 261314640.0 Active 06/10/2010 - U67100MH2009PTC192147 ISHWARSHAKTI WEALTH ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 01/05/2009 - -
Associated with Directors