VIJAY AGARWAL KUMAR
-
About VIJAY AGARWAL KUMAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L26939OR1977PLC000735 NILACHAL REFRACTORIES LIMITED 205112500.0 Active 19/12/2005 - U11723WB1948PTC017230 GENERAL YARN TRADERS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 30/10/1976 - U29230WB2005PTC106722 UNIMARK METALLURGICAL PVT LTD 800000.0 Active 16/12/2005 - U29300WB1986PTC041393 NUMAC INDIA PVT LTD 200000.0 Active 15/10/1986 - U40102WB2007PTC117307 NAVITUS POWER SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/11/2007 - U45400WB2007PTC118507 VIRAJ HEIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 12/09/2007 - U51432OR2008PLC009915 NRL CLAYBURN LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 02/02/2009 - U51502WB1992PLC055781 V.S. FINANCE LTD. 1607000.0 Active 20/09/1993 - U51909WB2008PTC130063 HELIOS GREEN ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/10/2008 - U74899WB1989PTC175152 ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIAL FURNACES PRIVATE LTD 27500000.0 Active 22/12/1998 - -
Associated with Directors