VIKRAM DHIRAJLAL SANGHVI
-
About VIKRAM DHIRAJLAL SANGHVI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U33110MH1997PTC111307 SCHILLER HEALTHCARE INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 65899000.0 Active 15/10/1997 - U51225MH1934PTC002213 THE OIL SEEDS TRADING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 08/12/1986 - U65910MH1983PTC030373 BOMBAY LEASING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 28/09/1999 - U67120MH1992PTC065766 SANGHVI SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/02/1993 -