VIKRAM NAVALCHAND SHAH
-
About VIKRAM NAVALCHAND SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400MH2010PTC200365 GARVITA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/12/2013 - U65929GJ2017PTC097790 RSL IFSC PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 07/06/2017 - U74992MH2006PTC164180 RIKHAV COMMODITY BROKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 4100000.0 Active 16/06/2013 - U99999MH1995PLC086635 RIKHAV SECURITIES LIMITED 18770000.0 Active 09/02/2015 -