VIKAS HARILAL MAPARA
-
About VIKAS HARILAL MAPARA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L67120MH1979PLC022039 SHREENATH INVESTMENT COMPANY LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 21/06/1999 - U23201MH1983PTC031175 SHAMYAK INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 19379600.0 Active 26/08/2015 - U40103MH2011PTC214454 AMITY SOLAR POWER PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2011 - U40106MH2010PTC206631 VISUAL PERCEPT SOLAR PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 198100000.0 Active 16/08/2010 - U65900MH1991PTC062460 SUDARSHAN SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 47910050.0 Amalgamated 15/03/2014 - U65990MH1991PTC061305 ENAM SHARES & SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 8800000.0 Amalgamated 29/03/1997 - U65990MH1994PTC081557 NIRMIT FINVEST AND PROPERTY PRIVATE LIMITED 25000000.0 Amalgamated 15/01/2001 - U67120MH2005PTC152297 ENAM SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED. 24243600.0 Active 15/11/2006 - U67200MH2003PTC142065 ENAM RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 105030.0 Amalgamated 18/10/2012 - U67200MH2003PTC142078 ENAM INSURANCE BROKER PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Amalgamated 18/10/2012 - U74140MH1986PTC040120 REEMA BUSINESS SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 27/12/2010 - U74900MH2007PTC173761 VA FRIENDSHIP SOLAR PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 240000.0 Active 26/02/2010 - U93000MH2010PTC199627 ENAM INFRASTRUCTURE TRUSTEESHIP SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 02/01/2017 - -
Associated with Directors