VIVEK GARG
-
About VIVEK GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65999DL1984PLC019465 VIKAS ECOTECH LIMITED 279899675.0 Active 25/07/2008 - U23209DL2005PTC139717 VIKAS POLYMERLAND PRIVATE LIMITED 1050000.0 Amalgamated 24/12/2012 - U29214DL2008PTC178399 A.G. AGROTECH & POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 09/07/2010 - U45200DL2006PTC153239 TRIVENI BHOOMI VIKAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/09/2006 - U70100DL2010PTC207589 VIKAS SURYA BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 58788800.0 Active 25/01/2014 - U74899DL1983PTC016345 VIKAS UTILITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3497000.0 Amalgamated 30/09/1996 - U80900DL2007PTC168529 MAHARAJA AGARSEN ACADEMY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/05/2009 - -
Associated with Directors