VIKAS KHUSHILAL DAK
-
About VIKAS KHUSHILAL DAK,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1973PTC016818 NAVKETTAN BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 30/09/1992 - U45400MH2011PTC211754 LA-VISTA SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/07/2013 - U70100MH1973PTC016816 NAVKETAN ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/10/1992 - U70100MH1987PTC043787 PRITI CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 10/01/2001 - U70100MH1995PLC089607 NAVKETAN HOLDINGS AND INVESTMENTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 16/06/1995 - U70100MH1995PTC088096 NAVKETAN DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 05/05/1995 - U74990MH2009PTC190144 NAVKETTAN LOCKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/02/2009 - U74999MH2007PTC166885 NAVKETAN ENTERTAINMENTS & AMUSEMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/01/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
PIYUSH KHUSHILAL DAK Director SHILPA VIKAS DAK Director PADAMCHAND JABARCHAND KOTHARI Director