VIVEK RAGHAVESH SIRUR
-
About VIVEK RAGHAVESH SIRUR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01113KA1976PTC003027 MIPRO INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 2447000.0 Active 10/08/2001 - U01132PN1955PTC131061 COTMAC PRIVATE LIMITED 7430000.0 Active 01/12/1972 - U17111KA1981PTC004382 N A SIRUR(HUBLI)PRIVATE LIMITED 112800.0 Active 09/09/1981 - U31200PN1992PTC016377 COTMAC ELECTRONICS PRIVATE LIMITED 44271900.0 Active 06/07/1993 - U51101KA1919ULL001442 SIBELLA PRIVATE LIMITED 340000.0 Active 03/11/1977 - U51101KA1960PTC001408 MOGORA COSMIC PRIVATE LIMITED 29400000.0 Active 12/01/1968 - -
Associated with Directors