VINEET AGARWAL
-
About VINEET AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51909DL1994PLC235697 TRANSCORP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 50852390.0 Active 10/09/2001 - L70109TG1995PLC019116 TRANSPORT CORPORATION OF INDIA LIMITED 153154900.0 Active 18/06/1998 - U45203DL2007FTC161784 LOGLABS VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 7803000.0 Active 09/04/2007 - U60231DL2007PTC216625 TCI-CONCOR MULTIMODAL SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 70000000.0 Active 02/03/2010 - U63023KA1999PTC024769 TRANSYSTEM LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 80002000.0 Active 01/04/2006 - U74899DL1995PTC071514 GLOXINIA FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/05/2012 - U80904HR2014NPL052135 TCI INSTITUTE OF LOGISTICS 500000.0 Active 12/03/2014 - U91990MH2011NPL225012 YPO SOUTH ASIA CHAPTER 0.0 Active 13/07/2016 - -
Associated with Directors