VIVEK MUNDRA
-
About VIVEK MUNDRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51433WB1983PLC035882 AVRO COMMERCIAL CO LTD 31200000.0 Active 31/01/2000 - U17115KA1985PTC007016 DECCAN TEXTILES PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 15/07/1985 - U31500TG2008PTC060125 CRYSTAL DIGIMEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/07/2008 - U51909WB2001PTC093603 NARAYANI MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 06/02/2005 - U65999WB1986PTC040316 JET AGE FINANCE PVT. LTD. 33600000.0 Active 24/02/2007 - U67120WB1995PTC071292 JET AGE SECURITIES PVT LTD 41625000.0 Active 28/04/1995 - U70101WB1992PTC055407 AMARJYOTI PROPERTIES PVT LTD 2233000.0 Active 01/03/2012 - U70109WB1995PTC075724 MERLIN HOLDINGS PVT. LTD. 2590000.0 Active 05/12/1995 - U85100TG2008PTC062090 SARVEJANA HEALTHCARE PRIVATE LIMITED 242832000.0 Active 11/01/2009 - U85110TG2011PTC074817 ASIAN INSTITUTE OF NEPHROLOGY AND UROLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED 219671590.0 Active 14/07/2013 - -
Associated with Directors