VINEET AGARWAL
-
About VINEET AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74950WB1984PLC038336 MANAKSIA LIMITED 131068000.0 Active 23/11/2014 - U25201WB2002PTC095100 SWEKA CAPS PRIVATE LIMITED 5300000.0 Active 19/03/2015 - U27100WB2010PLC144410 MANAKSIA FERRO INDUSTRIES LIMITED 30500000.0 Active 25/03/2010 - U27106WB2004PLC099659 AGRIM STEEL INDUSTRIES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 03/09/2004 - U27107WB2001PLC093630 MARK STEELS LIMITED 42857140.0 Active 25/10/2010 - U51109WB1999PTC090475 TITANIC MANUFACTURING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 130000.0 Active 16/07/2004 - U51909WB2010PTC152743 ANURADHA TREXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 850000.0 Active 01/09/2010 - U67120WB2000PLC092019 MAXELL SECURITIES LIMITED 4500000.0 Active 13/07/2000 - U74140WB1995PTC074602 KRISHNA DEVLO CONSULTANCY PVT.LTD. 2050000.0 Active 27/06/2008 - -
Associated with Directors